CA AB1923 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 10103.8 to the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential property insurance: wildfires: consolidated debris removal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2018-01-25AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
2018-01-24AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code10103.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback