CA AB1923 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 663, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 399.20 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bioenergy feed-in tariff.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1923 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1923 Wood By Gaines (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1923 WOOD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 663, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2016-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2016-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6341.).
2016-08-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2016-08-23SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5297.).
2016-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-19SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2016-08-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-01SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2016-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-08SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2016-06-02SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
2016-05-12SenateReferred to Com. on E., U., & C.
2016-05-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-05-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4684.)
2016-04-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2016-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27).
2016-04-20AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2016-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2016-04-13AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2016-04-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2016-04-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2016-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 30).
2016-03-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2016-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & C.
2016-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
2016-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code399.20Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1923&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1923_bill_20160211_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1923_bill_20160405_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1923_bill_20160414_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1923_bill_20160602_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1923_bill_20160819_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1923_bill_20160831_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1923_bill_20160926_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1923_vote_20160330_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1923_vote_20160427_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1923_vote_20160505_1031AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1923_vote_20160621_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1923_vote_20160823_0430PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1923_vote_20160829_0350PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback