CA AB1923 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2851 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: solar energy systems: theft prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1923 Evans By Kehoe (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1923 Evans Reconsider (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1923 EVANS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1923 Evans Reconsider (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1923 EVANS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-13 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2010-08-30 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-30 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 5030.) | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 18. Noes 13. Page 4713.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Kehoe. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4713.) | |
2010-06-16 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 15). | |
2010-05-20 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2010-05-06 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-06 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 25. Page 5045.) | |
2010-05-05 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-04 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (May 3). | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2010-04-08 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2010-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |