CA AB1917 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act making appropriations for the support of the government of the State of California and for several public purposes in accordance with the provisions of Section 12 of Article IV of the Constitution of the State of California, relating to the state budget, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2020.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1917 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1917 |