CA AB1916 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 8626.5 and 8634.5 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Proclaimed state and local emergencies: proclamations, communications, and materials: translation.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8626.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8634.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1916 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1916 |