CA AB1916 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19818.11 to the Government Code, relating to civil service.
Title
Civil service: Personnel Classification Plan: salary equalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1916 Cooper et al. By Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1916 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1916 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5549.). |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 5521.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 25). |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-01-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19818.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |