CA AB1912 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-06 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 16 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6508.1 of, to add Sections 6508.2, 20574.1, and 20575.1 to, and to repeal and add Section 20577.5 of, the Government Code, relating to public agencies, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees’ retirement: joint powers agreements: liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1912 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26).
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2018-06-11SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 5475.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and JUD.
2018-01-24AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
2018-01-23AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code20461.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20574.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20575.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20831Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6508.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6508.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code366.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback