CA AB1912 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 909, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 909, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6508.1 and 20575 of, to add Sections 6508.2 and 20574.1 to, and to repeal and add Section 20577.5 of, the Government Code, relating to public agencies, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Public employees’ retirement: joint powers agreements: liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1912 RODRIGUEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1912 Rodriguez By Portantino (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1912 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1912 Rodriguez By Portantino (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1912 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 909, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 6055.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26). |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 5475.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and JUD. |
2018-01-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 20461.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20574.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20575 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20575.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 20831 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6508.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6508.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 366.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |