CA AB1912 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 585, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 585, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 28 (commencing with Section 79601) to Part 2 of Division 22 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to bees, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California Apiary Research Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-16 - Assembly - AB 1912 EVANS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1912 Evans By Hancock (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1912 EVANS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1912 Evans By Hancock (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1912 EVANS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 585, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-27 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:20 p.m. | |
2010-08-16 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 6221.) | |
2010-08-11 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-11 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 4461.) | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-07-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 15). | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on F. & A. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on F. & A. | |
2010-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 5405.) | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-20 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 20). | |
2010-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2010-04-08 | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-07 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-06 | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2010-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |