CA AB1906 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 19885.5 to the Government Code, relating to peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pregnant peace officers: duty assignment policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1906 Salas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1906 Salas et al. By Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 1906 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2020-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.)
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-03-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2020-03-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2020-01-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2020-01-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 8.
2020-01-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code19885.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback