CA AB1906 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 878, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 878, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6601 and 6601.3 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health: sexually violent predators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1906 MELENDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1906 Melendez By Morrell (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Assembly - AB 1906 MELENDEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1906 Melendez By Morrell (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Assembly - AB 1906 MELENDEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 878, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6127.). |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5053.). |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4040.) |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2016-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 6601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 6601.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |