CA AB1901 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 276, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 276, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 12.5 (commencing with Section 122395) to Part 6 of Division 105 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to dog training.
Title
Dog training services: disclosure requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1901 Nazarian Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1901 Nazarian By Newman (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1901 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1901 Nazarian By Newman (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1901 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 276, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 14.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 5075.). |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 11. Page 4569.) |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 19). |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 122395 | New Code | See Bill Text |