CA AB1901 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21080.37 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: exemption: roadway projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1901 OBERNOLTE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 6. Page 4897.) |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 16). |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS. |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |