CA AB1897 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 429, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 429, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the California Victim Compensation Board, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Victim Compensation Board: claim.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1897 APPR. (Gonzalez Fletcher) By Portantino Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - AB 1897 APPR. Third Reading Urgency By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - AB 1897 APPR. Third Reading Urgency By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 429, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5909.). |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 13). |
2018-08-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6063.). |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |