CA AB1897 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to the California Victim Compensation Board, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Victim Compensation Board: claim.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Assembly - AB 1897 APPR. Third Reading Urgency By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-07-02AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.).
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-27AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-06-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-02-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
2018-01-22AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback