CA AB1896 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1035.2 of the Evidence Code, relating to evidence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual assault counselor-victim privilege.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1896 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1896 CERVANTES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-18 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-07-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5112.).
2018-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5219.)
2018-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2018-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD.
2018-01-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
2018-01-22AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Evidence Code1035.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback