CA AB1896 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25660 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control: proof of age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1896 Jeffries (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1896 JEFFRIES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1896 JEFFRIES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-08-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-08-09 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:50 p.m. | |
2010-08-05 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-05 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4372.) | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5454.) | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-04-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-20 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-19 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2010-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |