CA AB1892 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 69432, 69432.7, and 69439 of, and to add Section 69439.5 to, the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student financial aid: Cal Grant C awards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30AssemblyFrom committee without further action.
2016-05-27AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2016-04-27AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2016-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2016-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2016-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
2016-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code69432Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69432.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69439Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69439.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback