CA AB1891 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 25503.56 and 25503.57 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage licensees: instructional tastings: craft distillers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1891 Levine By Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1891 LEVINE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-14SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5129.)
2018-05-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-02-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-01-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
2018-01-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code25503.56Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25503.57Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback