CA AB1890 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12990 of the Government Code, relating to discrimination.
Title
Discrimination: equal pay: state contracting.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1890 DODD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1890 Dodd By Mitchell (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1890 DODD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1890 Dodd By Mitchell (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1890 DODD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6289.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5231.). |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5221.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 27). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2016-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2016-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12990 | Amended Code | Citation Text |