CA AB1890 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 81, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 23302 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: toll highways: motorcycles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-25 - Assembly - AB 1890 SOLORIO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1890 Solorio (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - AB 1890 SOLORIO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 81, Statutes of 2012.
2012-07-10 Approved by the Governor.
2012-06-29 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2012-06-25 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5415.).
2012-06-18 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2012-06-18 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3958.).
2012-06-14 Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2012-06-13 From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2012-06-06 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2012-05-03 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2012-04-26 Referred to Com. on T. & H.
2012-04-16 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2012-04-16 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4374.)
2012-04-11 Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2012-04-10 From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9).
2012-03-29 Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2012-03-28 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2012-03-05 Referred to Com. on TRANS.
2012-02-23 From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2012-02-22 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code23302Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1890&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1851-1900/ab_1890_bill_20120222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1851-1900/ab_1890_bill_20120328_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1851-1900/ab_1890_bill_20120503_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1851-1900/ab_1890_bill_20120606_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1851-1900/ab_1890_bill_20120626_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1851-1900/ab_1890_bill_20120710_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1851-1900/ab_1890_vote_20120409_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1851-1900/ab_1890_vote_20120416_1154AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1851-1900/ab_1890_vote_20120612_000005_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1851-1900/ab_1890_vote_20120618_1249PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1851-1900/ab_1890_vote_20120625_1241PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback