CA AB189 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 396, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 396, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 9.2 (commencing with Section 8758) to Division 1 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Arts Council: cultural districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-08 - Assembly - AB 189 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB189 Bloom By Allen (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 189 BLOOM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB189 Bloom By Allen (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 189 BLOOM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 396, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2939.). |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2431.). |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1346.) |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and L. GOV. |
2015-01-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. |
2015-01-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8758 | New Code | See Bill Text |