CA AB1889 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17072 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income tax: deductions: adjusted gross income: teachers’ expenses.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] |
Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] | Asm. Thurston Smith [R] |
Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (May 5). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4560.) |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |