CA AB1886 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 13.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 13.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1720 of the Labor Code, relating to public works.
Title
Public works: definition.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1886 Cooper Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1886 Cooper Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1886 Cooper By Newman (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1886 Cooper By Newman (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1886 Cooper Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1886 Cooper Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1886 Cooper By Newman (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1886 Cooper By Newman (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1886 Cooper Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 13.) |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 50. Noes 10.) |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Cooper. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 100 suspended. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 12.) | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5242.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 9. Page 5020.) |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 6). |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |