CA AB1885 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 584, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 584, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 602.4 of the Penal Code, relating to malicious mischief.
Title
Malicious mischief: airport property: transportation
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1885 HILL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1885 Hill By Yee (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1885 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1885 Hill By Yee (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1885 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 584, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6645.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 68. Noes 9. Page 6683.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 4829.) | |
2010-08-20 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-19 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-02 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-29 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-28 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 22). | |
2010-05-13 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-04-29 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-29 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 4934.) | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-07 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 6). | |
2010-03-23 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2010-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |