CA AB1882 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3130 of, and to add Section 3133 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas: groundwater monitoring.
Sponsors
Asm. Das Williams [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2016-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3133 | New Code | See Bill Text |