CA AB1882 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held without recommendation.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held without recommendation.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1255.4 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health facilities: chilling or therapeutic hypothermia.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held without recommendation. | |
2010-03-23 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-11 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-03-10 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2010-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |