CA AB188 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 629, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 44125 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle retirement and replacement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 188 Salas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB188 Salas et al. By Lara (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # AB188 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 188 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 629, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2017-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3332.).
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
2017-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2753.).
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-08SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
2017-09-05SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2017-09-05AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2017-09-05AssemblyWithdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2349.).
2017-08-23SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2017-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 21).
2017-07-13SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-07-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1924.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-28AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-01-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-01-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
2017-01-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code44125Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback