CA AB188 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 64, 480.1, 480.2, and 482 of, and to add Sections 480.9, 486, 486.5, and 488 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: change in ownership.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2013-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 480.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 480.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 480.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 482 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 486 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 486.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 488 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_188&sess=1314&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0151-0200/ab_188_bill_20130128_introduced.html |