CA AB1879 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 481, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 2775.7 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to gas corporations, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gas corporation: service connections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1879 Santiago et al. By Bradford Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1879 Santiago et al. By Bradford Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1879 Santiago et al. By Bradford Urgency Clause (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1879 SANTIAGO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 481, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-18 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 6075.).
2018-08-29SenateReconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6001.)
2018-08-29SenateRead third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 25. Noes 1. Page 6001.)
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-05-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5305.).
2018-05-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2018-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2018-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2018-04-04AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-01-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
2018-01-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code2775.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback