CA AB1874 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 181, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 181, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8506.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to structural pest control.
Title
Structural pest control.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-15 - Assembly - AB 1874 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1874 Wood (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1874 WOOD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1874 Wood (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1874 WOOD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 181, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5810.). |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4872.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4594.) |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2016-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 8506.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |