CA AB1873 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to mutual aid, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
County costs: mutual aid: reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-04-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-28 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-03-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-02-23 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |
2012-02-22 | Read first time. To print. |