CA AB1872 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 32000 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms: unsafe handguns.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Assembly - AB 1872 VOEPEL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15).
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-03-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 4260.)
2018-03-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-03-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 6).
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
2018-01-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code32000Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback