CA AB1872 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Public safety.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1872 GRAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5166.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 7. Page 5251.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (May 27). |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2016-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 830.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |