CA AB187 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-01 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-01 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12087.3 to the Government Code, to amend Sections 50807 and 50811 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 11.8 (commencing with Section 50811) of Part 2 of Division 31 of, to add Section 1530.90 to, to add Division 2.8 (commencing with Section 1890) to, and to repeal and add Section 130208 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 11166 and 11174.34 of the Penal Code, to add and repeal Sections 17131.12 and 17131.19 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 319, 319.3, 358.1, 361.2, 361.22, 366, 366.1, 366.3, 366.31, 636, 706.5, 706.6, 727.12, 727.2, 2200, 4094, 4094.2, 4094.5, 4096, 4096.6, 10609.4, 11004.1, 11266, 11330.7,11403, 11403.2, 11450, 11450.025, 11461, 11461.36, 11461.6, 11462, 11462.01, 11463, 11466.36, 12201.06, 12301.61, 16001, 16501.1, 16501.35, 16501.45, 16501.5, 16501.6, 16501.95, 16523.58, 16524.9, 16587, 16589, 18358.30, 18900.8, 18930, and 18995 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 18997.2 of, to amend and repeal Section 12301.24 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 13753, 13754, 13757, and 18930.5 of, to add Sections 2200.2, 2200.5, 2200.7, 8151.5, 11450.027, 12300.6, 15768, 18926.8, 18928.5, and 18997.3 to, to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 9156) to Chapter 2 of Division 8.5 of, to add Chapter 10.2 (commencing with Section 18936) to Part 6 of Division 9 of, to repeal Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 4362) of Part 3 of Division 4 of, and to repeal Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 8151) of Division 8 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, and to amend and repeal Section 135 of Chapter 27 of the Statutes of 2019, relating to public social services, and making an appropriation therefore, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Human services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 187 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 187 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 27). |
2022-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 505.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |