CA AB1869 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 7158, 7159.5, 7159.14, and 7161 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend and repeal Sections 27712, 27753, 29550.1, 29550.2, and 29550.3 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 27706, 27707, 27750, 27752, 29550, and 29551 of, and to add Section 6111 to, the Government Code, and to amend and repeal Sections 987.4, 987.5, 987.8, 987.81, 1203.1b, 1203.1e, 1210.15, 3010.8, and 6266 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 295, 987, 987.2, 1000.3, 1203, 1203.016, 1203.018, 1203.1bb, 1203.1d, 1203.9, 1208, 1208.2, 1208.3, and 4024.2 of, and to add Section 1465.9 to, the Penal Code, relating to fees, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1869 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1869 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1869 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17.)
2020-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7.).
2020-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-27SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2020-08-27SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-08-24SenateJoint Rules 61 and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.)
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2020-06-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14.)
2020-03-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-03-09AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2020-03-09AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2020-03-09AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 4273.)
2020-02-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-02-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
2020-01-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-01-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
2020-01-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7158New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7159.14New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7159.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code7161New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code27706New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code27707New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code27712Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code27750New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code27752New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code27753Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code29550New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code29550.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code29550.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code29550.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code29551New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1000.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1203New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1203.016New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1203.018New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1203.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1203.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1208New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1208.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1208.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1210.15Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code295New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code3010.8Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code4024.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code6266Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code987New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code987.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code987.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code987.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code987.8Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code987.81Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback