CA AB1869 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1001.80 of the Penal Code, relating to diversion, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military diversion: restitution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-06AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-02-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
2018-01-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1001.80Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback