CA AB1868 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 12803 of, to repeal Article 1 (commencing with Section 12820) of Chapter 1 of Part 2.5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, and to repeal and add Sections 12838 and 12838.1 of, the Government Code, to add Section 13015 to, to repeal Section 830.5 of, and to repeal and add Sections 830.5 and 2816 to, the Penal Code, to amend Sections 207.1, 207.2, 209, 210.2, 707.1, and 912 of, to add Sections 736.5 and 1955.2 to, to amend and repeal Section 731 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 607 and 730 of, to add Section 736.5 to, to add Chapter 1.7 (commencing with Section 1990) to Division 2.5 of, to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 2200) to, to add and repeal Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 2250) of Division 2.5 of, to repeal Sections 207.6 and 2202 of, and to repeal and add Sections 208.5, 1703, 1710, 1711, 1712, 1714, 1731.5, 1752.2, and 1762 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Juvenile justice realignment: Office of Youth and Community Restoration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1868 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1868 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (August 29). |
2020-08-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 4864.) |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 4273.) |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12803 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13015 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 830.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 1955.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 207.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 207.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 210.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 707.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 731 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 736.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 912 | Amended Code | Citation Text |