CA AB1867 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 45, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 45, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 12945.21 of the Government Code, to add Section 113963 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 248.5 of, and to add Sections 248 and 248.1 to, the Labor Code, relating to worker protections, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Small employer family leave mediation: handwashing: supplemental paid sick leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1867 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1867 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1867 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1867 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1867 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 45, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 5458.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 5457.) |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9.). |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 29). |
2020-08-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 4864.) |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 4273.) |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12945.21 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 113963 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 248 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 248.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 248.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |