CA AB1867 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 12950.5 to the Government Code, relating to sexual harassment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment discrimination: sexual harassment: records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 1867 REYES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1867 Reyes By Wienertd colspan="2"> ? (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1867 Reyes By Wiener (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1867 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-08-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-20AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6367.).
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 5268.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-21SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 19).
2018-06-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 13).
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 10. Page 5157.)
2018-05-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 2).
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2018-01-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
2018-01-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12950.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback