CA AB1864 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 300, 320, 321, 326, and 351 of, to add Division 24 (commencing with Section 90000) to, and to repeal Section 371 of, the Financial Code, and to amend Section 11041 of the Government Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
Financial institutions: regulation: Department of Financial Protection and Innovation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1864 Limón Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1864 Limón By Mitchell (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1864 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1864 Limón By Mitchell (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1864 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 5482.). |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10.). |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 29). |
2020-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 4299.) |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 4862.) |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 4273.) |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 326 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 351 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 371 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 90000 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 11041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |