CA AB1863 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 16 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 17209 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income tax: deduction: commercial cannabis activity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1863 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 11. Page 5390.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-08AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 30).
2018-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-01-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
2018-01-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17209New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback