CA AB1862 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to community colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community colleges: waiver of student fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1862 SANTIAGO Third Reading Urgency (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-15SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-08SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-08SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-08-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 5542.).
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 25).
2018-05-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2018-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-03-21AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (March 20).
2018-03-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
2018-01-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
2018-01-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code13303Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback