CA AB1860 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 50077 of, and to add Section 50077.1 to, the Government Code, and to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 7300) to Part 1.7 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government finance.
Title
Local government finance: special taxes: homeless housing and services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 50077 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50077.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7300 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1860 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1860 |