CA AB1856 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 32282 and 56345 of, and to add Article 5.1 (commencing with Section 32289.7) to Chapter 2.5 of Part 19 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, the Education Code, relating to pupils.
Title
Pupils with exceptional needs: individualized education programs: emergency safety procedures.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32282 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 32289.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 56345 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1856 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1856 |