CA AB1855 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 583, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 583, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 9718.5 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to seniors.
Title
Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program: facility access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 1855 Nazarian Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1855 Nazarian By Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1855 Nazarian Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1855 Nazarian By Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1855 Nazarian Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 583, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5020.). |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4658.) |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9718.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |