CA AB1843 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 53600 to the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 1771.1 and 1773.3 of the Labor Code, and to add Chapter 11 (commencing with Section 19150) to Part 2 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, and to amend Section 2 of Chapter 527 of the Statutes of 2013, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1843 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-30SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
2018-08-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 28).
2018-08-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-08-27SenateJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5778.)
2018-08-27SenateJoint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5777.)
2018-08-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-23SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 16).
2018-08-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-08-13SenateJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 5262.)
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5115.)
2018-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.)
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2018-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code53600New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code1771.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1773.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code19150New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback