CA AB1842 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-14 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-14 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 58506 to the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Section 12098.5 of, and to add Section 18660.5 to, the Government Code, to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 130075) to Chapter 1 of Part 7 of Division 107 of, to add Chapter 17 (commencing with Section 50897) to Part 2 of Division 31 of, and to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 128590) to Part 3 of Division 107 of, the Health and Safety Code, to add Sections 4114.1 and 14306.7 to the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 17059.2 and 23689 of, and to add Sections 17053 and 23682 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to add Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 2050) to Division 3 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to economic development.
Title
California Works and Recovery Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-01-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 6. |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 58506 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12098.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18660.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130075 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 14306.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 4114.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17059.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23682 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23689 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2050 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1842 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB1842 |