CA AB1841 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 5795, 14549.2, and 14581 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 12987.5 of, and to add Section 10609.21 to, the Water Code, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1841 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-30SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
2018-08-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-27SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-08-27SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-08-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 16).
2018-08-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-08-13SenateJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 5262.)
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5114.)
2018-05-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-07AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.)
2018-01-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-01-11AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
2018-01-10AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code14549.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14581Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5795Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code10609.21New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code12987.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback