CA AB1838 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 48985 of, and to add Section 47613.6 to, the Education Code, relating to pupils.
Title
Parental notices: primary language translations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48985 | New Code | See Bill Text |